MD SB456 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 351
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 351
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a court to dismiss a specified possession of marijuana charge if the court finds that the person used or possessed marijuana because of medical necessity; requiring a court to dismiss a specified possession of drug paraphernalia charge related to marijuana if the court finds that the person possessed the drug paraphernalia related to marijuana because of medical necessity; etc.
Title
Criminal Law - Marijuana and Drug Paraphernalia - Medical Necessity
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-06 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (100-34) (Y: 100 N: 34 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 351 |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2015-04-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (100-34) |
2015-04-10 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2015-04-10 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-04-10 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2015-03-31 | House | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-18 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-06 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Controlled Dangerous Substances
Courts
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Drugs
Equipment
Health
Courts
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Drugs
Equipment
Health