MD SB455 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-27 - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-27 - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the 2020 Census Complete Count Commission to ensure the fair and accurate counting of individuals in hard-to-count populations residing in the State and local jurisdictions in the 2020 Census; requiring the Commission to perform certain duties; authorizing the Commission to establish subcommittees; requiring the Commission to submit an interim report and a final report to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before November 30, 2019, and June 30, 2020, respectively; etc.
Title
2020 Census Complete Count Commission
Sponsors
Sen. Guy Guzzone [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-27 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Advertising
Census
Committees and Commissions
Demographics
Elections
Electronic Government
Planning, Department of
Reports
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Sunset
Advertising
Census
Committees and Commissions
Demographics
Elections
Electronic Government
Planning, Department of
Reports
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Sunset