MD SB454 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-29 - Hearing 2/13 at 12:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-29 - Hearing 2/13 at 12:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring each first responder and law enforcement officer in the State to complete certain mental health awareness training approved by the Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission.
Title
Public Safety – Mandatory Mental Health Training – First Responders and Law Enforcement Officers
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Pinsky [D] | Sen. Malcolm Augustine [D] | Sen. Brian Feldman [D] | Sen. Melony Griffith [D] |
Sen. Guy Guzzone [D] | Sen. Delores Kelley [D] | Sen. Jim Rosapepe [D] | Sen. Mary Washington [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-29 | Senate | Hearing 2/13 at 12:00 p.m. |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Same As/Similar To
HB1470 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-10 - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Emergencies
Emergency Medical Services
Fire Protection
Job Training
Law Enforcement
Mental and Behavioral Health
Police Training and Standards Commission
Public Health
Public Safety
Rescue Squads
Emergency Medical Services
Fire Protection
Job Training
Law Enforcement
Mental and Behavioral Health
Police Training and Standards Commission
Public Health
Public Safety
Rescue Squads
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Public Safety | 7 | 404 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0454?ys=2020RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/bills/sb/sb0454f.pdf |