MD SB452 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-08 - Delegates Moon, W. Fisher, and Bartlett
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing that, pending a determination by a court exercising criminal jurisdiction in a case involving a child whether to transfer its jurisdiction to the juvenile court, provisions of law relating to the confidentiality of juvenile records apply to all police records and court records concerning the child from the time of the child's arrest until a certain event occurs; establishing that, if a case is transferred to the juvenile court, certain provisions of law relating to confidentiality of juvenile records continue to apply; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Juveniles Charged as Adults – Confidentiality of Records

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-30 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (132-7) (Y: 132 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-08HouseDelegates Moon, W. Fisher, and Bartlett
2019-04-08HouseConference Committee Appointed
2019-04-08HouseHouse Refuses to Recede
2019-04-08SenateSenators West, Ready, and Waldstreicher
2019-04-08SenateConference Committee Appointed
2019-04-08SenateSenate Requests House Recede
2019-04-08SenateSenate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments
2019-04-06HouseThird Reading Passed with Amendments (132-7)
2019-04-05HouseSpecial Order until next session (Delegate Wilson) Adopted
2019-04-03HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-04-03HouseFavorable with Amendments {582412/1 Report Adopted
2019-04-03HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
2019-03-19HouseHearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-19HouseFirst Reading Judiciary
2019-03-18SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2019-03-18SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-18SenateFavorable with Amendments {538174/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-18SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2019-02-06SenateHearing 3/07 at 12:00 p.m.
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback