MD SB451 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-11 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 27
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-11 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 27
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the membership of the Procurement Improvement Council to add the Comptroller and the Attorney General; authorizing the Comptroller and the Attorney General to send designees to attend meetings of the Council if the Comptroller or the Attorney General is unable to attend; and expanding the duties of the Council to include providing a forum for the discussion of strategies to increase the participation of small, minority-owned, and women-owned businesses in procurement contracts.
Title
Procurement Improvement Council - Membership and Duties
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 33 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-11 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 27 |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (33-13) |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Senate Concurs House Amendments |
2023-03-29 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2023-03-28 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-03-28 | House | Favorable with Amendments {143824/1 Adopted |
2023-03-27 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2023-03-14 | House | Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-03-10 | House | Referred Health and Government Operations |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {403728/1 Adopted |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-02-02 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Same As/Similar To
HB429 (Crossfiled) 2023-04-11 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 26
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Finance and Procurement | 12 | 105 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |