MD SB450 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-20 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-20 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the governing body of Frederick County to grant a property tax setoff to a municipal corporation in specified minimum amounts for specified taxable years; making the Act an emergency measure; etc.
Title
Frederick County - Property Tax Setoff
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-07 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-20 | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) | |
2010-04-04 | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (135-2) | |
2010-04-03 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-04-03 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-04-10 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means | |
2010-04-07 | Hearing 4/8 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-04-07 | Re-referred Ways and Means | |
2010-03-28 | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations | |
2010-04-07 | Passed Enrolled | |
2010-04-07 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2010-04-07 | Senate Concur - House Amendments | |
2010-03-31 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | |
2010-03-30 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-03-30 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-04-01 | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation | |
2010-02-03 | Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading Budget and Taxation |