MD SB446 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-21 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 152
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-21 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 152
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing certain confidentiality requirements for peer support counseling programs for fire, rescue, or emergency medical services entities; and requiring the Behavioral Health Administration, in consultation with the Maryland Institute for Emergency Medical Services Systems, to issue a report on certain best practices relating to peer support counseling for fire, rescue, or emergency medical services entities and to make certain information regarding peer support counseling publicly available on the Administration's website.
Title
Public Safety - Fire, Rescue, or Emergency Medical Services Entities - Peer Support Programs
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-31 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 128 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-21 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 152 |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2022-03-31 | House | Third Reading Passed (128-0) |
2022-03-30 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-03-30 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2022-03-18 | House | Hearing 3/22 at 1:30 p.m. |
2022-03-07 | House | Referred Health and Government Operations |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {263525/1 Adopted |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-27 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Same As/Similar To
HB581 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-21 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 151
Subjects
Counselors
Disclosure
Electronic Government
Emergency Medical Services
Fire Protection
Health, Department of
Mental and Behavioral Health
Privacy
Public Safety
Reports
Rescue Squads
Subpoenas
Disclosure
Electronic Government
Emergency Medical Services
Fire Protection
Health, Department of
Mental and Behavioral Health
Privacy
Public Safety
Reports
Rescue Squads
Subpoenas
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Public Safety | 7 | 404 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |