MD SB438 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 447
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 447
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Baltimore City Young Readers Program within the Division of Children and Youth of the Governor's Office of Crime Prevention, Youth, and Victim Services to mail free, high-quality books to certain children; establishing the Young Readers Matching Grant Program within the Division to provide matching grants to affiliated services to support the establishment and operation of certain book-gifting services; requiring the Deputy Director of the Division to administer the programs; etc.
Title
Young Readers Programs - Establishment (Young Readers Program Expansion Act)
Sponsors
Sen. Cory McCray [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-04 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 123 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-16 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 447 |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2022-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (123-0) |
2022-04-01 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-03-31 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2022-03-21 | House | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-03-18 | House | Referred Ways and Means |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {333022/1 Adopted |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
HB383 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 446
Subjects
Age
Appropriations
Baltimore City
Budgets
Counties
Crime Prev., Youth, and Victim Service, Governor's Office of
Education - Miscellaneous
Exemptions
Gifts
Governor
Grants
Libraries
Literacy
Nonprofit Organizations
Partnerships
Poverty
Publications
State Government - Regulations and Procedures
Youth
Appropriations
Baltimore City
Budgets
Counties
Crime Prev., Youth, and Victim Service, Governor's Office of
Education - Miscellaneous
Exemptions
Gifts
Governor
Grants
Libraries
Literacy
Nonprofit Organizations
Partnerships
Poverty
Publications
State Government - Regulations and Procedures
Youth
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Human Services | 8 | 1401 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Human Services | 8 | 1402 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Human Services | 8 | 1403 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |