MD SB436 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB838
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-14 - Referred Economic Matters
Pending: House Economic Matters Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-14 - Referred Economic Matters
Pending: House Economic Matters Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing a certain civil penalty and administrative penalty for employers knowingly failing to properly classify individuals as employees; and requiring the Commissioner of Labor and Industry to refer to the Comptroller and the U.S. Department of Labor certain complaints that allege a violation of certain tax laws under certain circumstances.
Title
Workplace Fraud and Prevailing Wage - Violations - Penalties and Referrals
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-14 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 34 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-14 | House | Referred Economic Matters |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (34-12) |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {413727/1 Adopted |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-19 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SB838 (Carry Over) 2023-03-22 - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
HB465 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 309
HB465 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 309
Subjects
Comptroller
Crimes and Punishments
Federal Government
Fraud
Labor and Industry, Division of
Penalties and Sentences
Private Sector Labor and Industry
Procurement
Revenue and Taxes
Salaries and Compensation
State Government - Procurement
State's Attorneys
Taxes - Income
Work, Labor, and Employment
Crimes and Punishments
Federal Government
Fraud
Labor and Industry, Division of
Penalties and Sentences
Private Sector Labor and Industry
Procurement
Revenue and Taxes
Salaries and Compensation
State Government - Procurement
State's Attorneys
Taxes - Income
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Labor and Employment | 3 | 909 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Labor and Employment | 3 | 910 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 17 | 227 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |