MD SB436 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1018
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 244
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 244
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the regulations adopted by the State Board of Education to govern the licensing and operation of child care centers to include provisions that establish certain qualifications for probationary employment for an individual applying for the first time to be a child care teacher in a certain child care center in the State; requiring a child care center to terminate or reassign a certain individual at the end of a 6-month probationary period if the individual has not completed the required pre-service training; etc.
Title
Child Care Centers - Teacher Qualifications
Sponsors
Sen. Nancy King [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-02 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 129 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 244 |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2021-04-02 | House | Third Reading Passed (129-2) |
2021-04-02 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-04-02 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2021-03-22 | House | Hearing canceled |
2021-03-12 | House | Hearing 3/24 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-03-03 | House | Referred Ways and Means |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Hearing 2/11 at 11:00 a.m. |
2021-01-20 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
HB597 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 243
SB1018 (Carry Over) 2020-03-04 - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
SB1018 (Carry Over) 2020-03-04 - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Age
Child Care
Children
Education
Education - Miscellaneous
Education, State Department of
Job Training
Nurses
Social Workers
Special Education
Teachers
Work, Labor, and Employment
Child Care
Children
Education
Education - Miscellaneous
Education, State Department of
Job Training
Nurses
Social Workers
Special Education
Teachers
Work, Labor, and Employment