MD SB436 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-02 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 267
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Exempting specified indemnity mortgage transactions from the recordation tax; making indemnity mortgage transactions subject to recordation tax after a specified date; authorizing a specified calculation or allocation of recordation tax on indemnity mortgage transactions; altering the transaction amount that is subject to the recordation tax for supplemental instruments of writing; making specified refinancing instruments exempt from the recordation tax; altering the definition of "supplemental instrument of writing"; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Recordation Taxes - Exemptions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (132-0) (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-03-22 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-02SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 267
2013-04-08SenateReturned Passed
2013-04-06HouseThird Reading Passed (132-0)
2013-04-05HouseSecond Reading Passed
2013-04-05HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2013-04-05HouseFavorable Report by Ways and Means
2013-04-04HouseHearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
2013-04-02HouseRereferred to Ways and Means
2013-03-26HouseFirst Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
2013-03-26SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2013-03-25SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2013-03-25SenateFloor Amendment (Senator Kittleman) {673824/1 Adopted
2013-03-25SenateFavorable with Amendments {589637/1 Report Adopted
2013-03-25SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
2013-03-05SenateHearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
2013-01-30SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=sb0436&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2013rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2013RS/bills/sb/sb0436f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2013RS/bills/sb/sb0436t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2013RS/Chapters_noln/CH_267_sb0436t.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2013RS/amds/bil_0006/sb0436_58963701.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2013RS/amds/bil_0006/sb0436_67382401.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2013RS/fnotes/bil_0006/sb0436.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2013RS/votes_comm/sb0436_b&t.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2013RS/votes_comm/sb0436_w&m.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=sb0436,s-0780&stab=02&ys=2013RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=sb0436,h-1070&stab=02&ys=2013RS

Bill Comments

feedback