MD SB434 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-25 - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Reducing to $25 the penalty for outstanding civil citations for video toll violations assessed on or before July 1, 2021.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vehicle Laws – Failure to Pay Video Toll – Outstanding Fines

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-25SenateHearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
2021-01-20SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings

Same As/Similar To

HB291 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-11 - Withdrawn by Sponsor

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Transportation211414(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback