MD SB434 | 2016 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB299
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-3)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-22 - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-22 - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the owner and operator of a food service facility with an annual gross income of $400,000 or more and a seating capacity of 50 or more persons to develop and, beginning on October 1, 2017, to implement an automated external defibrillator program that meets specified requirements; and requiring the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene and the Maryland Institute for Emergency Medical Services Systems jointly to adopt specified regulations.
Title
Food Service Facilities - Automated External Defibrillator Program (The Joe Sheya Act)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (41-6) (Y: 41 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-22 | House | Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-25 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (41-6) |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {447875/1 Report Adopted |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-01 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SB434 (Carry Over) 2016-03-22 - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Commerce and Business
Education
Emergencies
Equipment
Health
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Inspections
Public Health
Restaurants
Rules and Regulations
Education
Emergencies
Equipment
Health
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Inspections
Public Health
Restaurants
Rules and Regulations