MD SB434 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-05 - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-05 - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the State Board of Education to issue requests for proposals for Social Impact Bonds on or before January 1, 2014; authorizing the State Board to issue additional requests for proposals as needed; establishing minimum proposal guidelines; establishing minimum project selection guidelines; authorizing the State Board to contract with specified entities; requiring the State Board to submit reports to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before September 1, 2015, and annually on or before September 1 thereafter; etc.
Title
State Board of Education - Social Impact Bonds - Request for Proposals
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-05 | Senate | Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation) |
2013-01-30 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Bonds
Education, State Board of
Primary and Secondary Education
Procurement
Reports
Social Services
State Government - Procurement
Education, State Board of
Primary and Secondary Education
Procurement
Reports
Social Services
State Government - Procurement