MD SB433 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-5)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 349
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-5)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 349
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring licensed funeral establishments or holders of permits for the business of operating a crematory in the possession of unclaimed cremated human remains for 90 days or more to provide identifying information to specified veterans service organizations to determine if the unclaimed cremains are those of a veteran or an eligible dependent; requiring specified veterans service organizations to make a specified notification of specified information within 45 days of receipt of the identifying information of the unclaimed cremains; etc.
Title
Funeral Establishments and Crematories - Unclaimed Cremains of Veterans - Disposition
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-08 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 349 |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendments |
2015-04-13 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (138-0) |
2015-04-13 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-04-13 | House | Favorable with Amendments {346087/1 Report Adopted |
2015-04-13 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2015-04-01 | House | Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-18 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {547473/1 Report Adopted |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance) |
2015-02-06 | Senate | First Reading Finance and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Business Regulation and Occupations
Cemeteries
Cremation
Death
Disclosure
Good Samaritan
Health Occupations
Identification
Liability
Morticians
Nonprofit Organizations
Notices
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Veterans
Veterans Affairs, Department of
Cemeteries
Cremation
Death
Disclosure
Good Samaritan
Health Occupations
Identification
Liability
Morticians
Nonprofit Organizations
Notices
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Veterans
Veterans Affairs, Department of