MD SB431 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-02 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 266
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing the University System of Maryland Board of Regents to maintain and manage quasi-endowment funds; limiting a specified transfer to a specified quasi-endowment fund; and altering a specified reporting requirement.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Higher Education - University System of Maryland - Quasi-Endowments

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-03-31 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-02SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 266
2013-04-05SenateReturned Passed
2013-04-05HouseThird Reading Passed (136-0)
2013-04-04HouseSecond Reading Passed
2013-04-04HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2013-04-03HouseSpecial Order until 4/4 (Delegate Simmons) Adopted
2013-04-03HouseFavorable
2013-04-03HouseFavorable Report by Appropriations
2013-03-28HouseHearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
2013-03-26HouseFirst Reading Appropriations
2013-03-25SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2013-03-22SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2013-03-22SenateFavorable with Amendments {919030/1 Report Adopted
2013-03-21SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
2013-02-20SenateHearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
2013-01-30SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=sb0431&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2013rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2013RS/bills/sb/sb0431f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2013RS/bills/sb/sb0431t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2013RS/Chapters_noln/CH_266_sb0431t.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2013RS/amds/bil_0001/sb0431_91903001.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2013RS/fnotes/bil_0001/sb0431.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2013RS/votes_comm/sb0431_b&t.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2013RS/votes_comm/sb0431_app.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=sb0431,s-0756&stab=02&ys=2013RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=sb0431,h-1037&stab=02&ys=2013RS

Bill Comments

feedback