MD SB43 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 373
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Exempting an individual from the requirement to not be subject to compulsory school attendance and to have withdrawn from school in order to be eligible to obtain a high school diploma by examination if the individual participates in a GED Option Program administered by the State Department of Education that creates a pathway to a high school diploma by examination for certain currently enrolled high school English language learner students under the age of 21 years.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

High School Diploma by Examination - Eligibility Requirements - Exemption

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (132-0) (Y: 133 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-08SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 373
2018-04-09SenateReturned Passed
2018-04-06HouseThird Reading Passed (132-0)
2018-04-05HouseSecond Reading Passed
2018-04-05HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2018-04-05HouseFavorable Report by Economic Matters
2018-03-12HouseHearing canceled (Ways and Means)
2018-03-22HouseHearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
2018-02-02HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters and Ways and Means
2018-02-01SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2018-01-30SenateSecond Reading Passed
2018-01-30SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2018-01-29SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2018-01-16SenateHearing 1/16 at 1:30 p.m. (Finance)
2018-01-10SenateFirst Reading Finance and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2017-09-18SenatePre-filed

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback