MD SB425 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 203
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 203
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the uses of the Historic Preservation Loan Fund; and authorizing the Maryland Historic Trust to transfer funds from the Fund to a qualified cooperating nonprofit organization for certain purposes.
Title
Maryland Historic Trust - Historic Preservation Loan Fund - Qualified Cooperating Nonprofit Organizations - Transfers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-10 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-24 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 203 |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2023-04-10 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-1) |
2023-04-08 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2023-04-08 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2023-03-26 | House | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-03-26 | House | Hearing canceled |
2023-03-22 | House | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-03-14 | House | Referred Appropriations |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {113022/1 Adopted |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-02-02 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Same As/Similar To
HB674 (Crossfiled) 2023-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 204
Subjects
Appropriations
Estates and Trusts
Historical Matters
Nonprofit Organizations
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Treasurers
Estates and Trusts
Historical Matters
Nonprofit Organizations
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Treasurers
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Finance and Procurement | 5A | 327 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |