MD SB425 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Enrolled on March 18 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing the Critical Medical Needs Program in the Office of Home Energy Programs of the Family Investment Administration within the Department of Human Services in recognition of the challenges with energy bills faced by individuals with critical medical needs and limited financial resources; requiring the Office to work with electric and gas companies to implement, for critically medically vulnerable individuals, a hold or extension of service for those losing service and restoration where service has been terminated; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Home Energy Assistance - Critical Medical Needs Program

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18SenateReturned Passed
2019-03-15HouseThird Reading Passed (138-0)
2019-03-14HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-14HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-14HouseFavorable Report by Economic Matters
2019-03-08HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters
2019-03-07SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2019-03-05SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-05SenateFavorable with Amendments {837578/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-04SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2019-02-14SenateHearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-01SenateFirst Reading Finance

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback