MD SB423 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-05 - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting, beginning in fiscal year 2022, the Maryland Transit Administration from entering into a contract to purchase buses for the Administration's transit bus fleet that are not electric buses; requiring the Administration, on or before January 1, 2021, and each January 1 thereafter, to submit a report to certain committees of the General Assembly on the implementation of the Act; providing for the contents of the annual report; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maryland Transit Administration - Conversion to Electric Buses (Electric Bus Transition Act)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-05SenateHearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
2020-01-27SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Budget and Taxation

Same As/Similar To

HB432 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-16 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Budget and Taxation

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Transportation7406(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback