MD SB423 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 31
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 31
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing the maximum number of specified Class A alcoholic beverages licenses in Prince George's County; and authorizing the Board of License Commissioners to convert a specified Class B-DD alcoholic beverages license to be a specified Class A alcoholic beverages license to be issued to an establishment located within the Towne Centre at Laurel; prohibiting the Board of License Commissioners from issuing more than a specified number of Class B-DD (Development District) licenses under specified circumstances.
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Towne Centre at Laurel - Class A License
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-14 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 31 |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendments |
2015-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (139-0) |
2015-04-03 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-04-03 | House | Favorable with Amendments {313998/1 Report Adopted |
2015-04-03 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2015-03-25 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-06 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
License Commissioners, Boards of
Municipal Corporations
Prince George's County
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
License Commissioners, Boards of
Municipal Corporations
Prince George's County