MD SB420 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-10 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-10 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing the maximum amount from $10,000 to $15,000 that a court may allow for specified funeral expenses; establishing that, if an estate is solvent, a personal representative is not required to obtain an allowance by the court for funeral expenses if the estate is under modified administration and the funeral expenses are included on a specified report; and applying the Act prospectively.
Title
Estates and Trusts - Funeral Expenses Allowance - Modified Administration
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Lee [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-10 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {208777/1 Report Adopted |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-06 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |