MD SB42 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 549
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Clarifying that any payment toward, written or oral affirmation of, or any other activity on a certain debt that occurs after the expiration of the statute of limitations applicable to the consumer debt collection action does not revive or extend the limitations period; and providing that a certain provision of law may not be interpreted to affect the statute of limitations applicable to a cause of action arising from a certain agreement or payment plan entered into before the expiration of a certain statute of limitations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Courts - Consumer Debt Collection Actions - Statute of Limitations

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (132-0) (Y: 133 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-08SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 549
2018-04-09SenateReturned Passed
2018-04-06HouseThird Reading Passed (132-0)
2018-04-05HouseSecond Reading Passed
2018-04-05HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2018-04-05HouseFavorable Report by Judiciary
2018-03-21HouseHearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-20HouseFirst Reading Judiciary
2018-02-19SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2018-02-15SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-02-15SenateFavorable with Amendments {518773/1 Report Adopted
2018-02-14SenateLaid Over (Senator Middleton) Adopted
2018-02-14SenateFavorable with Amendments {518773/1
2018-02-12SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2018-01-16SenateHearing 1/16 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-01-10SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2017-11-02SenatePre-filed

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback