MD SB417 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 626
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Repealing a termination provision for certain provisions of law relating to policy and reporting requirements for race-based traffic stops; requiring the Maryland Statistical Analysis Center, by September 1 each year, to post on its website in a certain location a filterable data display showing traffic stop data collected for the previous calendar year that allows a person to filter the traffic stop data by county, municipality, or law enforcement agency and to review certain visuals; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vehicle Laws – Race–Based Traffic Stops – Policy and Reporting Requirements

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-1) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-1) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-25SenateEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 626
2019-04-08SenatePassed Enrolled
2019-04-08HouseThird Reading Passed (137-1)
2019-04-08HouseConference Committee Report Adopted
2019-04-08SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2019-04-08SenateConference Committee Report Adopted
2019-04-06HouseDelegates Fraser-Hidalgo, Love, and Bridges
2019-04-06HouseConference Committee Appointed
2019-04-06HouseHouse Refuses to Recede
2019-04-05SenateSenators Carter, Washington, and West
2019-04-05SenateConference Committee Appointed
2019-04-05SenateSenate Requests House Recede
2019-04-05SenateSenate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments
2019-04-05HouseThird Reading Passed with Amendments (137-1)
2019-04-04HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-04-04HouseFavorable with Amendments {760113/1 Report Adopted
2019-04-04HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
2019-03-28HouseRereferred to Environment and Transportation
2019-03-26HouseFirst Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
2019-03-25SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2019-03-22SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-22SenateFavorable with Amendments {418273/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-21SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2019-02-06SenateHearing 3/05 at 12:00 p.m.
2019-02-01SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0417?ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0417f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0417t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0417e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/Chapters_noln/CH_626_sb0417e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0007/sb0417_41827301.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0007/sb0417_76011301.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0007/sb0417_55322701.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0007/sb0417_67372701.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0007/sb0417.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0417_jpr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0763.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0417_ent.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1346.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/amds/bil_0007/sb0417_67372701.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1556.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/1395.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback