MD SB414 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 455
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 455
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Governor's Office of Small, Minority, and Women Business Affairs to collaborate with certain State entities to identify all State resources available to small businesses and develop a plan to coordinate resources with the Office; requiring the Office to convene a workgroup to study and make recommendations regarding the collection of data by State agencies that may be used to assist small businesses in accessing State resources and bidding on State contracts; requiring a certain report from the Office by December 1, 2018; etc.
Title
Governor’s Office of Small, Minority, and Women Business Affairs – Small Business Resources and Data Collection
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-30 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 455 |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2018-04-07 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2018-04-03 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2018-04-03 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-04-03 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2018-03-21 | House | Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-09 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {844039/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-25 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Budget and Management, Department of
Commerce and Business
Commerce, Department of
Committees and Commissions
Data
General Services, Department of
Minorities
Reports
Small Business
State Government - Procurement
State Government - Regulations and Procedures
Sunset
Transportation, Department of
Women
Budget and Management, Department of
Commerce and Business
Commerce, Department of
Committees and Commissions
Data
General Services, Department of
Minorities
Reports
Small Business
State Government - Procurement
State Government - Regulations and Procedures
Sunset
Transportation, Department of
Women