MD SB414 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Passed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-02 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 259
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the definition of "foster care recipient" to include individuals who are placed into guardianship or who are adopted out of an out-of-home placement by a guardianship family, as specified; providing that specified foster care recipients are eligible for a specified tuition waiver if the recipient is enrolled in a vocational certificate program at a public institution of higher education in the State, subject to specified conditions; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Higher Education - Tuition Waiver - Foster Care Recipients

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-03-19 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-02SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 259
2013-04-04SenateReturned Passed
2013-04-04HouseThird Reading Passed (139-0)
2013-04-02HouseSecond Reading Passed
2013-04-02HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2013-04-02HouseFavorable Report by Appropriations
2013-03-28HouseHearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
2013-03-21HouseFirst Reading Appropriations
2013-03-21SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2013-03-19SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2013-03-19SenateFloor Amendment (Senator Muse) {413323/1 Adopted
2013-03-19SenateFavorable with Amendments {504337/1 Report Adopted
2013-03-18SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2013-02-13SenateHearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
2013-01-28SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=sb0414&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2013rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2013RS/bills/sb/sb0414f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2013RS/bills/sb/sb0414t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2013RS/Chapters_noln/CH_259_sb0414t.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2013RS/amds/bil_0004/sb0414_41332301.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2013RS/amds/bil_0004/sb0414_50433701.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2013RS/fnotes/bil_0004/sb0414.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2013RS/votes_comm/sb0414_ehe.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2013RS/votes_comm/sb0414_app.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=sb0414,s-0653&stab=02&ys=2013RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=sb0414,h-0941&stab=02&ys=2013RS

Bill Comments

feedback