MD SB414 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-02 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing an intake officer of the Department of Juvenile Services, after conducting a specified inquiry, to file with a court an application for an arrest warrant prepared by a law enforcement officer; specifying requirements relating to an application for an arrest warrant under the Act; providing that an arrest warrant under the Act may only be issued by the court on a finding of probable cause; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Juvenile Law - Taking Child into Custody - Arrest Warrant

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-04-06 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-04-01 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-05-02 Approved by the Governor
2012-04-06 Third Reading Passed (131-2)
2012-04-05 Second Reading Passed
2012-04-05 Favorable Report Adopted
2012-04-09 Favorable Report by Judiciary
2012-04-09 Hearing 4/9 at 4:30 p.m.
2012-04-09 Re-referred Judiciary
2012-04-02 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
2012-04-06 Returned Passed
2012-04-01 Third Reading Passed (47-0)
2012-03-31 Second Reading Passed with Amendments
2012-03-31 Favorable with Amendments 718879/1 Report Adopted
2012-04-06 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2012-02-01 Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
2012-02-01 First Reading Judicial Proceedings

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback