MD SB413 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-6)
Status: Passed on April 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 323
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-6)
Status: Passed on April 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 323
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting discrimination based on military status with regard to housing and employment.
Title
Discrimination - Military Status - Prohibition
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-29 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-29 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 323 |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Senate Concurs House Amendments |
2024-03-29 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2024-03-27 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-03-27 | House | Favorable with Amendments {593925/1 Adopted |
2024-03-27 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2024-03-25 | House | Hearing 3/26 at 1:30 p.m. |
2024-03-25 | House | Hearing canceled |
2024-03-19 | House | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-02-23 | House | Referred Health and Government Operations |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-1) |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {653026/1 Adopted |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-18 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Same As/Similar To
HB598 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 322
Subjects
Appraisals
Apprentices
Armed Forces
Banks and Trust Companies
Commerce and Business
Commission on Civil Rights
Contracts
Credit
Discrimination
Education
Financial Institutions
Harassment
Health
Health Insurance
Health, Department of
Hospitals
Housing
Human Relations
Insurance
Insurance Administration
Job Training
Leases and Rent
Loans
Patients
Private Schools
Procurement
Public Schools
Real Estate
Recruitment and Hiring
Salaries and Compensation
State Employees
Students
Unions
Utilities
Veterans
Washington Suburban Sanitary District
Work, Labor, and Employment
Apprentices
Armed Forces
Banks and Trust Companies
Commerce and Business
Commission on Civil Rights
Contracts
Credit
Discrimination
Education
Financial Institutions
Harassment
Health
Health Insurance
Health, Department of
Hospitals
Housing
Human Relations
Insurance
Insurance Administration
Job Training
Leases and Rent
Loans
Patients
Private Schools
Procurement
Public Schools
Real Estate
Recruitment and Hiring
Salaries and Compensation
State Employees
Students
Unions
Utilities
Veterans
Washington Suburban Sanitary District
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Government | 20 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 20 | 1103 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 20 | 601 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 20 | 602 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 20 | 603 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 20 | 604 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 20 | 605 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 20 | 606 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 20 | 610 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 20 | 702 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 20 | 704 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 20 | 705 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 20 | 707 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |