MD SB408 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Vetoed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the calculation of the interest rate paid on a security deposit under a residential lease or a mobile home park rental agreement; altering the requirements for a customized calculator that the Department of Housing and Community Development is required to maintain on its Web site; applying the Act to any interest accruing on a security deposit under a residential lease or mobile home park rental agreement on or after January 1, 2015; etc.
Title
Real Property - Residential Leases - Interest on Security Deposits
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-04 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2015-04-11 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2015-04-10 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2015-04-07 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2015-04-07 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-04-06 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2015-03-24 | House | Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-18 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-06 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Electronic Government
Housing and Community Development, Department of
Interest
Landlord and Tenant
Leases and Rent
Mobile and Manufactured Homes
Real Property
Security Deposits
Housing and Community Development, Department of
Interest
Landlord and Tenant
Leases and Rent
Mobile and Manufactured Homes
Real Property
Security Deposits