MD SB408 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 47
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 47
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Specifying that the duties to which the Sheriff of Washington County is required to assign special deputy sheriffs include specified duties; making the provision of county liability insurance to a special deputy sheriff discretionary, rather than mandatory; establishing that designation as a special deputy sheriff does not authorize the special deputy sheriff to perform law enforcement duties outside the special deputy sheriff's jurisdiction except under specified circumstances; etc.
Title
Washington County - Special Deputy Sheriffs
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-09 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 47 |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2013-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2013-04-01 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2013-04-01 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-04-01 | House | Favorable Report by Environmental Matters |
2013-03-28 | House | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-03-14 | House | First Reading Environmental Matters |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {508772/1 Report Adopted |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-01-28 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Courts and Court Personnel - Local
Emergencies
Insurance
Jurisdiction
Law Enforcement
Liability
Sheriffs
Traffic Regulation
Washington County
Courts and Court Personnel - Local
Emergencies
Insurance
Jurisdiction
Law Enforcement
Liability
Sheriffs
Traffic Regulation
Washington County