MD SB408 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-13 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-13 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the person designated on a United States Department of Defense Record of Emergency Data (DD Form 93) to arrange for the final disposition of the body of a member of the United States armed forces if the decedent died while serving in the United States armed forces and executed the Record of Emergency Data; and making the Act an emergency measure.
Title
Public Health - Disposition of Remains - Armed Forces Members
Sponsors
Sen. John Astle [D] | Sen. Richard Colburn [R] | Sen. Robert Garagiola [D] | Sen. Katherine Klausmeier [D] |
Sen. Douglas Peters [D] | Sen. Catherine Pugh [D] | Sen. Jamin Raskin [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-02-25 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-02-25 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-13 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-04-01 | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (138-0) | |
2010-03-31 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-03-31 | Floor Amendment (Delegate O'Donnell) Adopted | |
2010-03-31 | Special Order later today (Delegate O'Donnell) Adopted | |
2010-03-31 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-04-07 | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations | |
2010-03-17 | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-26 | First Reading Health and Government Operations | |
2010-04-05 | Passed Enrolled | |
2010-04-05 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2010-04-05 | Senate Concur - House Amendments | |
2010-02-25 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2010-02-23 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-02-23 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-02-22 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance | |
2010-02-03 | Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-01-29 | First Reading Finance |