MD SB407 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 272
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 272
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing to 3,000 megawatts the statewide limit on rated generating capacity for net energy metering under a certain contract or tariff available to certain eligible customer-generators.
Title
Electricity – Net Energy Metering – Limit
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-30 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 94 N: 40 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-12 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-12 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 272 |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2021-03-30 | House | Third Reading Passed (94-40) |
2021-03-30 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-03-29 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2021-03-16 | House | Referred Economic Matters |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {867274/1 Adopted |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Motion Laid Over (Senator Reilly) Adopted |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {867274/1 |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2021-01-15 | Senate | Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-01-15 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Same As/Similar To
HB569 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 271
Subjects
Contracts
Energy
Energy Matters
Public Service Commission
Utilities
Utility Regulation
Weights and Measures
Energy
Energy Matters
Public Service Commission
Utilities
Utility Regulation
Weights and Measures
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities | 7 | 306 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities | 7 | 306.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |