MD SB407 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that the trustees and employees of the Chesapeake Bay Trust are exempt from the provisions of the Public Ethics Law subject to the adoption of conflict of interest provisions for nonprofit organizations; requiring the Trust to keep on file and make available for public inspection specified conflict of interest provisions; and making specified technical changes.
Title
Public Ethics - Chesapeake Bay Trust - Exemptions and Conflict of Interest Provisions
Sponsors
Sen. John Astle [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-25 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (131-4) (Y: 131 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-15 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2014-04-01 | House | Third Reading Passed (131-4) |
2014-03-31 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2014-03-31 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-03-31 | House | Favorable Report by Environmental Matters |
2014-03-19 | House | Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-13 | House | First Reading Environmental Matters |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Chesapeake Bay
Committees and Commissions
Ethics
Inspections
Natural Resources - Generally
Nonprofit Organizations
Public Information
Records
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Work, Labor and Employment
Committees and Commissions
Ethics
Inspections
Natural Resources - Generally
Nonprofit Organizations
Public Information
Records
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Work, Labor and Employment