MD SB405 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB496
Note: Carry Over of previous SB83
Note: Carry Over of previous SB83
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-10 - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-10 - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a person from committing computer-related crimes with the intent to interrupt or impair the functioning of a public safety answering point; prohibiting a person from committing computer-related crimes which interrupt or impair the functioning of a public safety answering point; and authorizing certain penalties.
Title
Criminal Law – Public Safety – Interference With a Public Safety Answering Point – Penalties
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-10 | Senate | Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-02-01 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Same As/Similar To
SB405 (Carry Over) 2023-02-10 - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
SB83 (Carry Over) 2022-03-16 - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
HB744 (Crossfiled) 2023-03-15 - Referred Judicial Proceedings
SB83 (Carry Over) 2022-03-16 - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
HB744 (Crossfiled) 2023-03-15 - Referred Judicial Proceedings
Subjects
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Cybersecurity
Emergency Services
Penalties and Sentences
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Cybersecurity
Emergency Services
Penalties and Sentences
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Criminal Law | 7 | 302 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0405?ys=2023RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2023RS/bills/sb/sb0405f.pdf |