MD SB404 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-26 - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-26 - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Altering, for a taxable year beginning after December 31, 2022, the percentage of the federal earned income tax credit used for determining the amount that an individual may claim as a refund under the Maryland earned income tax credit under certain circumstances.
Title
Working Marylanders Tax Relief Act of 2022
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-26 | Senate | Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Same As/Similar To
HB422 (Crossfiled) 2022-01-27 - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Tax - General | 10 | 704 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0404?ys=2022RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2022RS/bills/sb/sb0404f.pdf |