MD SB40 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 240
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 240
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Office of Student Financial Assistance within the Maryland Higher Education Commission to award at least 25% of annual grant money from the Richard W. Collins III Leadership With Honor Scholarship to students at Bowie State University.
Title
Higher Education – Richard W. Collins III Leadership With Honor Scholarship – Bowie State
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-01 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 240 |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2021-04-01 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2021-03-31 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-03-30 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2021-03-22 | House | Hearing canceled |
2021-03-20 | House | Hearing 3/24 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-02-11 | House | Referred Appropriations |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-01-06 | Senate | Hearing 1/27 at 11:00 a.m. |
2021-01-13 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-10-14 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB1124 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 239
Subjects
Higher Education
Higher Education Commission
Minorities
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
State Universities and Colleges
Weights and Measures
Higher Education Commission
Minorities
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
State Universities and Colleges
Weights and Measures