MD SB389 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-02 - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-02 - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the State Board of Education and the Professional Standards and Teacher Education Board to adopt regulations for the certification of and renewal of a certificate for dual language teachers in public schools on or before December 31, 2024; requiring the State Department of Education to develop guidelines for implementing dual language immersion programs in public schools; etc.
Title
Public Schools - Dual Language Education - Teacher Certification, Program Implementation, and Study
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-02 | Senate | Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-02-01 | Senate | First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment |
Same As/Similar To
HB56 (Crossfiled) 2023-01-12 - Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Certifications
Committees and Commissions
Continuing Education
Education, State Board of
Education, State Department of
Language
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Standards and Best Practices
Students
studies
Teachers
Time
Committees and Commissions
Continuing Education
Education, State Board of
Education, State Department of
Language
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Standards and Best Practices
Students
studies
Teachers
Time
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Education | 6 | 701 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 6 | 704.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 7 | 132 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0389?ys=2023RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2023RS/bills/sb/sb0389f.pdf |