MD SB388 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-11 - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-11 - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting an insurer from disclaiming coverage under a policy of liability insurance on the ground that the insured or a certain person has breached the policy by failing to cooperate with the insurer; and making a conforming change.
Title
Civil Actions - Liability Insurance - Prohibition on Disclaiming Coverage
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-11 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Hearing canceled (Finance) |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance) |
2019-01-31 | Senate | First Reading Finance and Judicial Proceedings |