MD SB386 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB373
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 538
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 538
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a Class ALP (assisted living program) beer, wine, and liquor license in Harford County; authorizing the Board of License Commissioners for Harford County to issue the license to a manager of an assisted living program, but not more than five Class ALP licenses to a person; authorizing the license holder to provide beer and wine for on-premises consumption by a resident or guest; authorizing the license holder to store liquor, prepare mixed drinks, and serve liquor or mixed drinks; establishing a license fee of $3,500; etc.
Title
Harford County – Alcoholic Beverages – Assisted Living Program License
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-30 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-30 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 538 |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2021-03-30 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-1) |
2021-03-30 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-03-28 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2021-03-19 | House | Referred Economic Matters |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {234538/1 Adopted |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Hearing 3/05 at 2:00 p.m. |
2021-01-15 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
HB312 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 537
SB373 (Carry Over) 2020-03-13 - Referred Economic Matters
SB373 (Carry Over) 2020-03-13 - Referred Economic Matters
Subjects
Age
Age of Majority
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Distribution
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Assisted Living
Boundaries
Certifications
Fees
Harford County
Job Training
License Commissioners, Boards of
Storage
Time
Work, Labor, and Employment
Age of Majority
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Distribution
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Assisted Living
Boundaries
Certifications
Fees
Harford County
Job Training
License Commissioners, Boards of
Storage
Time
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Alcoholic Beverages | 22 | 1001 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 22 | 102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 22 | 1405 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 22 | 1602 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 19 | 1801 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |