MD SB386 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-3)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 454
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-3)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 454
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Maryland Department of Health to initiate an investigation of certain nursing home complaints alleging actual harm within 10 business days after receiving the complaint; requiring the Department to make every effort to investigate within 24 hours complaints alleging immediate jeopardy to residents of certain nursing homes; requiring the Department to develop a certain data dashboard; etc.
Title
Maryland Nursing Home Resident Protection Act of 2018
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-12 - Senate - Senate Floor - Sustained (0-44) (Y: 1 N: 45 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-03-07 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-12 - Senate - Senate Floor - Sustained (0-44) (Y: 1 N: 45 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 454 |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2018-04-06 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2018-04-06 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2018-04-06 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-04-06 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2018-03-27 | House | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-07 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Floor Amendment {753520/1 (Senator Mathias) Adopted |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Special Order until 3/5 (Senator Mathias) Adopted |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Motion Reconsider Second Reading (Senator Mathias) Adopted |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {117679/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-25 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Abuse
Consumer Protection
Data
Electronic Government
General Assembly
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Health, Department of
Inspections
Investigations and Inquiries
Legislative Services, Department of
Nursing Homes
Public Information
Rules and Regulations
Time
Vulnerable Adults
Work, Labor and Employment
Consumer Protection
Data
Electronic Government
General Assembly
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Health, Department of
Inspections
Investigations and Inquiries
Legislative Services, Department of
Nursing Homes
Public Information
Rules and Regulations
Time
Vulnerable Adults
Work, Labor and Employment