MD SB384 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 8 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-04-08 - Passed Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Office of the Attorney General, in consultation with the Maryland Department of Health and the Maryland Department of Labor, to produce a guidance document, by December 30, 2021, concerning the application of employee protection laws to the use of personal care aides by residential service agencies; requiring a residential service agency to certify certain information on a certain form and through the signature of a certain individual as a condition of obtaining an initial license to operate and every 3 years thereafter; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health Facilities - Residential Service Agencies - Guidance and Reporting

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 98 N: 40 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-08SenatePassed Enrolled
2021-04-08SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2021-04-08SenateSenate Concurs House Amendments
2021-04-07HouseThird Reading Passed (98-40)
2021-04-06HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-04-06HouseFavorable with Amendments {333922/1 Adopted
2021-04-05HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2021-03-20HouseHearing canceled
2021-03-17HouseHearing 3/25 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-02-25HouseReferred Health and Government Operations
2021-02-24SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2021-02-23SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-02-23SenateFavorable with Amendments {717271/1 Adopted
2021-02-19SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2021-01-19SenateHearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
2021-01-15SenateFirst Reading Finance

Same As/Similar To

HB652 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-12 - Returned Passed

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health - General194A-01(n/a)See Bill Text
Health - General194A-11(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback