MD SB383 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 336
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Providing that a certain applicant or licensee is subject to a certain minority business participation goal established by the Special Secretary for the Office of Small, Minority, and Women Business Affairs; requiring a certain certification agency, in consultation with the General Assembly and the Office of the Attorney General, to study the Minority Business Enterprise Program to evaluate the program's compliance with certain requirements and to report to the Legislative Policy Committee by December 14, 2018; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Video Lottery Terminals - Minority Business Participation Goals - Sunset Extension

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-21 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-24SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 336
2018-04-09SenateReturned Passed
2018-03-28HouseThird Reading Passed (138-0)
2018-03-27HouseSecond Reading Passed
2018-03-27HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2018-03-26HouseFavorable Report by Ways and Means
2018-03-22HouseHearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-03-21HouseHearing canceled
2018-03-21HouseHearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-23HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means
2018-02-22SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2018-02-20SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-02-20SenateFavorable with Amendments {259234/1 Report Adopted
2018-02-19SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
2018-02-14SenateHearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-01-25SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback