MD SB380 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-07 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Motor Vehicle Administration, when it registers a Class L (historic) vehicle or Class N (street rod) vehicle, to issue a single registration plate for the vehicle.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vehicle Laws - Single Registration Plate - Class L (Historic) Vehicles and Class N (Street Rod) Vehicles

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-07HouseFirst Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
2015-04-06SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2015-04-03SenateSecond Reading Passed
2015-04-03SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2015-04-03SenateFavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
2015-02-24SenateHearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
2015-02-06SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback