MD SB380 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Curing previous Acts of the General Assembly with possible title defects.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Annual Curative Bill

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2012-03-08 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-15 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-04-10 Approved by the Governor
2012-03-08 Third Reading Passed (137-0)
2012-03-06 Second Reading Passed
2012-03-06 Favorable Report Adopted
2012-03-05 Favorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
2012-02-29 Hearing 3/2 at 2:30 p.m.
2012-02-16 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
2012-03-09 Returned Passed
2012-02-15 Third Reading Passed (47-0)
2012-02-13 Second Reading Passed
2012-02-13 Favorable Report Adopted
2012-02-10 Special Order until 2/13 (Senator Pipkin) Adopted
2012-02-10 Favorable
2012-02-10 Favorable Report by Senate Rules
2012-01-31 First Reading Senate Rules

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback