MD SB380 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-19 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-19 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the period during which an eligible customer-generator may accrue specified net excess generation; requiring a specified electric company to carry forward net excess generation until a specified consumption eliminates the net excess generation or specified accrual period expires; altering how the dollar value of a specified net excess generation is calculated; repealing a requirement that specified generation credit appear on the eligible customer- generator's bill in a dollar amount; etc.
Title
Electricity - Net Energy Metering
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-06 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-03-23 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-23 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-19 | Approved by the Governor | |
2011-04-06 | Third Reading Passed (137-0) | |
2011-04-04 | Second Reading Passed | |
2011-04-04 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2011-04-08 | Favorable Report by Economic Matters | |
2011-03-21 | First Reading Economic Matters | |
2011-04-06 | Returned Passed | |
2011-03-23 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | |
2011-03-21 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-03-21 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-03-18 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance | |
2011-02-09 | Hearing 3/8 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-03 | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Alternative Energy Sources
Cooperative Associations
Energy Matters
Equipment
Power Plants
Prices
Public Service Commission
Reports
Utilities
Cooperative Associations
Energy Matters
Equipment
Power Plants
Prices
Public Service Commission
Reports
Utilities