MD SB380 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-23 - Hearing 3/24 at 2:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Amending the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loans of 2007 and 2008 to alter the purpose of specified grants to the Mayor and City Council of the City of Laurel; extending the deadline by which the grantee must present evidence that a matching fund will be provided; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loans of 2007 and 2008 - Prince George's

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-03-23 Hearing 3/24 at 2:00 p.m.
2010-03-23 Hearing cancelled
2010-03-18 Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
2010-03-02 Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
2010-03-02 Hearing cancelled
2010-02-25 Hearing 3/17 at 2:00 p.m.
2010-01-28 First Reading Budget and Taxation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback