MD SB379 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-09 - Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-09 - Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing the requirement that the State Board of Education have the approval of the Governor in order to remove a member of the Caroline County Board of Education, the Charles County Board of Education, or the Prince George's County Board of Education under certain circumstances.
Title
Caroline County, Charles County, and Prince George's County Boards of Education - Removal of Member
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-04 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-09 | House | Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-03-09 | House | Referred Ways and Means |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-21 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Caroline County
Charles County
Education - Local Bills
Education, Boards of
Education, State Board of
Ethics
Governor
Prince George's County
Charles County
Education - Local Bills
Education, Boards of
Education, State Board of
Ethics
Governor
Prince George's County
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Education | 3 | 1002 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 3 | 501 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |