MD SB377 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-03 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 410
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-03 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 410
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the circumstances under which the payment of a benefit by a governmental unit or quasi-public corporation to a covered employee offsets the liability for benefits under the workers' compensation law; and stating that it is the intent of the General Assembly that the Maryland Association of Counties and the Professional Fire Fighters of Maryland jointly research and report data and analysis on the effects of the Act by December 1, 2024, to interested parties and certain committees of the General Assembly.
Title
Workers' Compensation - Benefits - Offset and Study
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-03 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 410 |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Senate Concurs House Amendments |
2023-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (131-1) |
2023-03-30 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-03-30 | House | Favorable with Amendments {253723/1 Adopted |
2023-03-30 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2023-03-20 | House | Referred Economic Matters |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2023-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-03-17 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {133529/1 Adopted |
2023-03-17 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-02-01 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Same As/Similar To
HB590 (Crossfiled) 2023-04-03 - Referred Rules
Subjects
Accidents
Deaf Persons
Diseases
Hearing Aids
Injury
Occupational Safety
Reports
studies
Weights and Measures
Work, Labor, and Employment
Workers' Compensation
Deaf Persons
Diseases
Hearing Aids
Injury
Occupational Safety
Reports
studies
Weights and Measures
Work, Labor, and Employment
Workers' Compensation
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Labor and Employment | 9 | 610 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |