MD SB371 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-08 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring a dental practice to be owned, managed, or operated by a licensed dentist, subject to certain exceptions; authorizing an unlicensed person to take certain actions; prohibiting a licensed dentist from raising a certain defense in a certain action; repealing a certain exemption from the requirements of the Maryland Dentistry Act; authorizing the State Board of Dental Examiners to take certain action against certain applicants and licensees for accepting or tendering rebates or split fees; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Board of Dental Examiners - Ownership, Management, or Operation of a Dental Practice

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (29-17) (Y: 30 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor - Favorable with Amendments Adopted (28-18) (Y: 29 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {523425/1 (Senator Zirkin) Rejected (22-22) (Y: 23 N: 23 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {453124/2 (Senator Hough) Rejected (13-32) (Y: 14 N: 33 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor - Motion Recommit to Committee (Senator Rosapepe) Rejected (21-25) (Y: 22 N: 26 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-08HouseUnfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
2019-04-02HouseHearing canceled
2019-03-21HouseHearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-19HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations
2019-03-18SenateThird Reading Passed (29-17)
2019-03-14SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-14SenateMotion Recommit to Committee (Senator Rosapepe) Rejected (21-25)
2019-03-14SenateFloor Amendment {453124/2 (Senator Hough) Rejected (13-32)
2019-03-14SenateFloor Amendment {523425/1 (Senator Zirkin) Rejected (22-22)
2019-03-14SenateFavorable with Amendments Report Adopted (28-18)
2019-03-14SenateCommittee Amendment Adopted
2019-03-14SenateFavorable with Amendments {654536/1
2019-03-13SenateSpecial Order until 3/14 (Senator Hough) Adopted
2019-03-13SenateFavorable with Amendments {654536/1
2019-03-12SenateLaid Over (Senator Jennings) Adopted
2019-03-12SenateFavorable with Amendments {654536/1
2019-03-11SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-01-31SenateHearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-31SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=sb0371&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0371f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0371t.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0001/sb0371_65453601.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0001/sb0371_45312402.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0001/sb0371_52342501.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0001/sb0371.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0371_ehe.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0505.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0506.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0507.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0508.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0615.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0371_hgo.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback