MD SB371 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 550
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 550
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Bureau of Revenue Estimates, beginning with the revenue estimate for fiscal year 2020, to calculate a specified share of General Fund revenues represented by specified nonwithholding income tax revenues; stating it is the goal of the State that 10% of estimated General Fund revenues in specified years be retained in the Revenue Stabilization Account; establishing the Fiscal Responsibility Fund for the purpose of retaining specified tax revenues to provide pay-as-you-go capital funds for specified purposes; etc.
Title
State Budget - Appropriations - Income Tax Revenue Estimate Cap and Revenue Stabilization Account
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-31 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-04 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 550 |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2017-04-07 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2017-04-06 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2017-04-06 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-04-06 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2017-04-05 | House | Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-04-04 | House | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2017-03-27 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {419234/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-26 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Appropriations
Budgets
Committees and Commissions
Comptroller
General Assembly
Governor
Income Tax
Investments
Legislation
Operating Budget
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Taxes - Income
Treasurers
Budgets
Committees and Commissions
Comptroller
General Assembly
Governor
Income Tax
Investments
Legislation
Operating Budget
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Taxes - Income
Treasurers